Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Maldonado, Linda, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Dean, William A, against Nic 4 Emerald Park Retirement Leasing Llc, represented by Teich, Scott Mitchell, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryNeg - Nursing Home Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Amended Complaint
Date: September 01, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: October 22, 2015Order Granting
Date: July 07, 2016Motion
Date: August 10, 2016Order
Date: September 19, 2016Notice
Date: March 21, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ARBITRATION |
|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT ARBITRATOR |
|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion TO APPOINT ARBITRATORParty: Plaintiff Maldonado, Linda |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Granting DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Law IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGSParty: Defendant NIC 4 Emerald Park Retirement Leasing LLC |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing May 3rd, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. Rm 780 |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Jury Trial | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement Party: Plaintiff Maldonado, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.