Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
State Of Florida, filed a(n) Involuntary Civil Commitment Of Sexually Violent Predators case represented by Satz, Michael Joseph, against Flowers, Alphonso, represented by Jakovich, Robert A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Tuter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryInvoluntary Civil Commitment Of Sexually Violent Predators |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a court document filed in Broward County, Florida. The document does not provide much information about the nature of the case or the specific allegations being made. It appears to be a motion that was considered by the court, and a...
Order
Date: July 30, 2015Petition
Date: July 30, 2015Order
Date: September 02, 2015Comment:
Date: August 07, 2015Unopposed Motion
Date: August 20, 2015Settlement Agreement
Date: September 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT/ PETITION IS TO BE RELEASED DIRECTLY FROM THE COURTROOM Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION
Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order RETURNING RESPONDENT TO COURT/09/02/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Rm 970 Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order UNOPPOSED ORDER INCREASING LIMIT OF RESPONDENT'S CASE-RELATED EXPENSES Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Unopposed Motion TO INCREASE DOLLAR AMOUNT TO PAY EXPERT WITNESSES AND COSTSParty: Defendant Flowers, Alphonso Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY-REQUEST FOR DAUBERT HEARINGParty: Defendant Flowers, Alphonso Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Flowers, Alphonso Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Comment: SEVENTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT UNIFORM TRIAL ORDER PETITIONS FOR INVOLUNTARY CIVIL COMMITMENT OF SEXUALY VIOLENT PREDATORS/ 09/02/2015 AT 9:30AM IN ROOM 970 Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Petition & Status - Aug 19, 2015 8:45; Trial Sep 2, 2015 9:30 Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE AND WARRANT FOR CUSTODIAL DETENTION Judge: 07 Tuter, Jack |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.