Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
City Of Fort Lauderdale, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Weissman, Bradley H, against Anderson, Brandon, Meriser, Julie, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2015 |
CategoryForfeiture (Prior To 7/1/16) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Petition (eFiled)
Date: July 17, 2015Order
Date: August 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06/08/2017 @ 10:00 AM RM 15170 Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Meriser, Julie Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication TO: Julie Meriser on or before 2/29/16 Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copy of Correspondence Party: Attorney Weissman, Bradley H Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Report Party: Plaintiff City of Fort Lauderdale Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 02/24/2016 8:45am #920A Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copy to Daily Business Review
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action Party: Defendant Meriser, Julie Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Constructive Service of Process
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.