Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Scott J. Israel, Sheriff Of Broward Cty, Florida, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Tsoubanos, Christian, Esq., against Santiago Haro, Jorge, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2015 |
CategoryForfeiture (Prior To 7/1/16) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint for forfeiture filed by Scott J. Israel, Sheriff of Broward County, Florida. The complaint is filed under the Florida Contraband Forfeiture Act. The Broward Sheriff's Office is the seizing agency in this case. T...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: July 17, 2015Motion to Transfer
Date: August 04, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Don't Docket On This Case
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complete File Received IN COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Transfer TO MIAMI-DADE COUNTY Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer CASE TO MIAMI DADE COUNTY, FLORIDAParty: Plaintiff Scott J. Israel, Sheriff of Broward Cty, Florida Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: CHRISTIAN TSOUBANOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A105417; ;Amount: $401.00 Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Scott J. Israel, Sheriff of Broward Cty, Florida Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
No Summons Issued
Judge: 21 Singer, Michele Towbin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.