Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stephens Pipe & Steel, Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Action Fence Enterprises, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2015 |
CategoryForeign Judgment (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Affidavit of Compliance/Judgment Attached (eFiled)
Date: July 17, 2015Foreign Judgment (eFiled)
Date: July 17, 2015Request for Production
Date: April 04, 2016Interrogatories
Date: April 04, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: April 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Showing Good Cause
Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO CANCEL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Stephens Pipe & Steel, LLC Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO RICHARD J. YOUNGParty: Plaintiff Stephens Pipe & Steel, LLC Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories TO RICHARD J. YOUNGParty: Plaintiff Stephens Pipe & Steel, LLC Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions TO RICHARD J. YOUNGParty: Plaintiff Stephens Pipe & Steel, LLC Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JUSTIN D JACOBSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A104814; ;Amount: $401.00 Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Compliance/Judgment Attached (eFiled)
Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Foreign Judgment (eFiled)
Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.