Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lakeview Health Systemss, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Allison, Julie Wynne, against Wilson, Brittany, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2015 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: July 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Indebtedness
Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees AND COST AFFIDAVIT OF JULIE W. ALLISON, ESO Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Jgmt MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Lakeview Health Systemss, LLC Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability
Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference February 2nd, 2017 at 8:45am rm 1040 Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Julie W. Allison, P.A Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Wilson, Brittany Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 08/13/15Party: Defendant Wilson, Brittany Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JULIE W. ALLISON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A108630; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 12 Frink, Keathan B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.