Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Burt, Colby, against Maceus, Micheline, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC against Micheline Maceus and other unknown parties. The complaint states that Carrington Mortgage Services is the holder of the note and mortgage on a property located ...
Letter/Answer
Date: October 19, 2015Motion for Leave to File
Date: February 11, 2016Letter/Answer
Date: February 22, 2017Complaint (eFiled)
Date: July 17, 2015Letter to Judge
Date: February 11, 2016Letter/Answer
Date: February 18, 2016Response
Date: March 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Before Hearing Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND ANSWERParty: Plaintiff Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter/Answer Party: Defendant Maceus, Micheline Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter/Answer Party: Defendant Maceus, Micheline Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to File AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Maceus, Micheline Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter to Judge Party: Defendant Maceus, Micheline Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.