Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Independent Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Harris Iii, Ben H, Esq., against Lupulescu, Lidia, represented by Booth, Mark F, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2014 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Independent Bank against Lidia Lupulescu in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. Independent Bank is a Michigan State-Chartered bank and is the successor in interest to Independe...
Request
Date: August 27, 2014Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 27, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;398490;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/2b1e7569-a47f-4471-9fdd-2dee94face35/results/e73d7d4f-8d09-4724-9076-dc97c514d0be/lines/b8f36e73-68c3-48c4-9d6e-86ccc46f169c/Doc Affidavit of Service Summons served 12/11/2014Party: Defendant Lupulescu, Lidia |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;430776;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/2b1e7569-a47f-4471-9fdd-2dee94face35/results/e73d7d4f-8d09-4724-9076-dc97c514d0be/lines/2d626a46-1aa8-4444-a839-ac283bc82b96/Doc Motion to Dismiss AND CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEESParty: Defendant Lupulescu, Lidia |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;370178;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/2b1e7569-a47f-4471-9fdd-2dee94face35/results/e73d7d4f-8d09-4724-9076-dc97c514d0be/lines/13901e6c-3504-4693-8691-50da45fc7e49/Doc Notice of Filing Affidavit OF NON-MILITARY SERVICEParty: Plaintiff Independent Bank |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;379534;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/2b1e7569-a47f-4471-9fdd-2dee94face35/results/e73d7d4f-8d09-4724-9076-dc97c514d0be/lines/6f7b8d5f-2736-4ed8-87cd-1955b582b5ac/Doc Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Independent Bank |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;370569;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/2b1e7569-a47f-4471-9fdd-2dee94face35/results/e73d7d4f-8d09-4724-9076-dc97c514d0be/lines/ad804e54-49e4-45fe-b45e-5f2798e717c5/Doc Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Independent Bank |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: BEN H. HARRIS III ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A118291; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: BEN H. HARRIS III ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A118291; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;385396;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/2b1e7569-a47f-4471-9fdd-2dee94face35/results/e73d7d4f-8d09-4724-9076-dc97c514d0be/lines/d106ae3b-61dd-42f0-8b1f-e9813bc94551/Doc Request Party: Plaintiff Independent Bank |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;374359;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/2b1e7569-a47f-4471-9fdd-2dee94face35/results/e73d7d4f-8d09-4724-9076-dc97c514d0be/lines/a2f3f8d8-8c4e-4f77-8b7a-7b6af4c9e928/Doc Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Independent Bank |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;396218;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/99b38ffa-5f09-4d64-ac32-5d29cbec23fb/runs/cs-b24edb9ba0b8c82c5c342c723ebc51f4/executions/2b1e7569-a47f-4471-9fdd-2dee94face35/results/e73d7d4f-8d09-4724-9076-dc97c514d0be/lines/a32008c8-1ab7-4a1e-8952-561246000dbd/Doc eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Lupulescu, Lidia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.