Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stevens, Kim F, against Green, Darren, Heron Pond Condominium Association Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, represented by Palacio, Ramon C, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC against Darren Green, the unknown spouse of Darren Green, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS) as nominee for Indymac Bank, F.S.B., and Heron Pond Condominium ...
Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 17, 2014Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 27, 2014Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage
Date: February 26, 2015Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: January 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to Brock & Scott PLLC Trust Account per cert ($61,100.00) mailed |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Title Was sold to: G & GJ INVESTMENTS 77, INC |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Bid Payor: Ibrahim Quitana ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20151RA1A009063; ;Amount: $61,100.00 |
|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Clerk's Fee Payor: Ibrahim Quitana ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20151RA1A009063; ;Amount: $924.00 |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
April 16, 2015 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: COLLINS MALLARD ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20151RA1A008714; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication at 10:00 AM on the 16th day of Apnl, 2015, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.