Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Willis, Adam, against Cach Llc, Mayorga, Alejandra, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Paradise Construction Enterprises, Inc, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Blackwell-Pineda, Denise, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 27, 2014Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 03, 2014Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: December 11, 2014Order Granting
Date: January 26, 2015Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: February 05, 2015Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: April 20, 2015Agreed Order
Date: January 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance as co-counsel for Plaintiff / Amanda Renee Murphy, Esq. |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ Returned Un-Used | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | eWrit Issuance - Possession Alias | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | eWrit Issuance - Possession | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ISSUING WRIT OF POSSESION; WRIT ISTAYED UNTIL 2/13/16. |
|
December 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Tyler E. Mesmei-, EsquireParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Company |
|
December 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing January 13, 2016 8:45 #519 |
|
December 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Company |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.