Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Assn, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Elmore Drew, Ashley Michelle, Esq., against Galloway, Kim E, Jakubiec, Donean E, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Assn, Nessen, Dean Edward, Plantation City Of, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2013Order Setting
Date: September 05, 2014Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: September 05, 2014Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 18, 2014Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage
Date: December 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Jury Questions | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
January 29, 2015 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Brandee Williams ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20151RA1A001940; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication SALE DATE 01/29/2015 @ 10AM |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney Party: Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Assn |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.