Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cypress Arms Condominium Ass Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mattingly, K Joy, Esq., against Christofano, John, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Cypress Arms Condominium Association, Inc. against John Christofano, the unknown spouse of John Christofano, and two unknown tenants. The association is seeking to foreclose a claim of lien for condominium assessments in ac...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Granting issuance for writ of possession |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued to BSO ck#15702. Unit 7 |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: KARENA JOY MATTINGLY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A008899; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession Party: Plaintiff Cypress Arms Condominium Ass Inc. |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 2/4/15 at 9:00am |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
December 04, 2014 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Jessy Padron ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20141RA1A030410; ;Amount: $70.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.