Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ivanhoe East At Century Village Condo #I Assn Inc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Otto, Charles F, Esq., against Garcia, Carlos, Garcia, Emma, Laparra, Marco, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCondominium Action - Condominium Action >$15,000 =$50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Ivanhoe East at Century Village Condominium #1 Association, Inc. against Emma Garcia, Carlos Garcia, and Marco Laparra. The association is seeking injunctive and other equitable relief, including the removal of residents fr...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 31, 2013Affidavit
Date: July 15, 2014Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: July 15, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit SECOND AMENDED |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit OF COSTS |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Fees | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 10/16/14 8:45 am rm 9920B |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR FINAL ORDER AWARDING PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTSParty: Plaintiff Ivanhoe East at Century Village Condo #I Assn Inc |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing September 9, 2014 at 8:45 AM rm 9920B |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation August 14, 2014 at 8:45 A.M |
|
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.