Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roefaro, Nicholas J, Esq., against Bank Of America Na, Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corp, Lauderdale Oaks Condo Ii Inc, Vasquez, Juana, represented by Sum, Alice K, Frydman, Rachel E, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGundersen, Andrea Ruth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Before Hearing |
|
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses and NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant Lauderdale Oaks Condo II Inc |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default JUDGE'SParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Vasquez, Juana Defendant Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corp |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance & designation of electronic mail addressesParty: Defendant Lauderdale Oaks Condo II Inc |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Bank Of America NA |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment of flcl and request for award of atty's fees (aff attached)Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Bank Of America NA |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time to respond to pl's complaintParty: Defendant Bank Of America NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.