Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Winarsky, Amy J, against Mathison, Gladys, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Subpoena Duces Tecum in Aid of Execution Retd Served
Date: June 24, 2014Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: October 09, 2013Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: November 10, 2014Motion
Date: June 18, 2013Motion for Contempt
Date: August 14, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation November 6,2014 |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Plaintiff Ford Motor Credit Company LLC |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Amended Order ON MOTION FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rule to Show Cause AMENDED |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt Party: Plaintiff Ford Motor Credit Company LLC |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum in Aid of Execution Retd Served | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: GRANTED |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing November 6, 2013, at 8:45 a.m RM 880b |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Plaintiff Ford Motor Credit Company LLC |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONEParty: Attorney Winarsky, Amy J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.