Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Provident Funding Assn Lp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels, Jonathan, against Bailey, Dorice, La Mirage Ho Assn Inc, represented by Ortiz, Cristina, Scheinman, Sydeny, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: August 20, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Comment: Original note and mortgage documents returned on 11/15/2013... |
|
September 24, 2013 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing September 18,2013 at 8:45 am |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale Party: Plaintiff Provident Funding Assn LP |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF AGREED ORDER GRANTING CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Provident Funding Assn LP |
|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Copies Mailed to all Parties; FJ/NSDB | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Original Note Original Mortgage |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale NSA 09/24/13 |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance #60911 AS COUNSEL FOR DORICE BAILEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.