Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Exist Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Stone, Todd Ian, against Famous Labels Of Sherman Llc, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 7/10/2013 @ 8:45 A.M. |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Returned Served 3/4/2013Party: Defendant Famous Labels of Sherman LLC |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Issued hb to runParty: Defendant Famous Labels of Sherman LLC |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Lost Summons Party: Defendant Famous Labels of Sherman LLC |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of no Svc of Process and Return of Lost Summons to Issuing Clerk of Court |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: STONE, TODD I ; Userid: CTS-cwilson ; Receipt: 20131YE1B000408; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: STONE, TODD I ; Userid: CTS-ygaspard ; Receipt: 20121YE1F005379; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: STONE, TODD I ; Userid: CTS-ygaspard ; Receipt: 20121YE1F005379; ;Amount: $401.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.