Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Saint-Hubert, Stacey-Ann, against Constant-Minviel, Mirdine E, Hidden Lake At Coconut Creek Ho Assn Inc, Minviel, Guy, represented by Backer, Keith F, Brown, David J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Agreed Order
Date: June 06, 2013Answer
Date: June 24, 2013Response to Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 09, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Pursuant to Settlement - Before Hearing |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank Na |
|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Minviel, Guy Defendant Constant-Minviel, Mirdine E |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Hidden Lake At Coconut Creek Ho Assn Inc |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Attorney Backer, Keith F |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss complaintParty: Defendant Minviel, Guy Defendant Constant-Minviel, Mirdine E |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic unknown tenant owners |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/26/12Party: Defendant Hidden Lake At Coconut Creek Ho Assn Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.