Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Federal Nat Mtg Assn, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Macmillan, Gavin, against Springtree Estates Assn Inc, Thomas, Natalie Nicole, Thomas, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage
Date: July 24, 2013Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: September 19, 2013Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: December 27, 2013Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: June 19, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing ORDER DISMISSING SUIT, CANCELING FORECLOSURE SALE, AND VACATING SUMMARY FINAL JUDGEMENTParty: Plaintiff Federal Nat Mtg Assn |
|
January 16, 2014 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing January 13, 2014 at 8:45AM RM 519 |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reopen Case Billed MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing ORDER TO CANCEL SALEParty: Plaintiff Federal Nat Mtg Assn |
|
September 26, 2013 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.