Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sheets, Misty, Esq., against Kearse, Jevon, Mortgage Elec Regis Systems Inc, represented by Sherman, Geoffrey E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Order
Date: June 25, 2015Statement of Good Cause
Date: July 07, 2015Agreed Order
Date: September 10, 2013Request to Produce
Date: November 22, 2013Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: March 16, 2015Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: March 19, 2015Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 14, 2014Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 14, 2014Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 22, 2013Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 05, 2013Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: July 09, 2015Interrogatories
Date: June 28, 2013Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 28, 2013Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: July 02, 2015Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: September 21, 2015Joint Stipulation
Date: September 30, 2015Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 23, 2013Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 02, 2015Notice of Prod of Documents
Date: October 02, 2015Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: February 01, 2016Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 04, 2015Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 28, 2016Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: October 02, 2015Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 25, 2016Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: September 14, 2016Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: June 28, 2016Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: May 13, 2016Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: September 21, 2016Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 19, 2016Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: November 03, 2016Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 28, 2013Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: February 06, 2017Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: March 09, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF ORDER TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE, DISMISS ACTION AND DISSOLVE THE LIS PEDENS |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: JONATHAN IAN MEISELS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A017614; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE, DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISSOLE THE LIS PENDENSParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: JONATHAN IAN MEISELS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A155658; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
September 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale GRANTED. |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale SET FOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2016Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.