Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fowler, Peter, against Country Isles Section One Maint Assn, Inc, Foster, Jack L, Giraldo, Alba, represented by Kowal, Brian P, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Pursuant to Settlement - Before Hearing |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Pl's ComplaintParty: Defendant Foster, Jack L Defendant Giraldo, Alba |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on df's motion for extension of time / Granted / df's shall have 20 days from date of this order to ile a response to pl |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Demand for written verification of reinstatement and payoff figures for consumer debt pursuant to fair debtcollection practices act.Party: Defendant Giraldo, Alba Defendant Foster, Jack L |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Michael J. Alterman (36825) as atty for df(s)Party: Defendant Giraldo, Alba Defendant Foster, Jack L |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Giraldo, Alba Defendant Foster, Jack L |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01-08-13Party: Defendant Country Isles Section One Maint Assn, Inc |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown spouse of Alba Giraldo aka Alba G. Foster |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/07/13 aka Alba G. Foster 30 daysParty: Defendant Giraldo, Alba |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown tenant # 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.