Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Confreda, Ralph W, Jr., against Cove At French Villas Condo Assn Inc, Hernandez, Anna C, Pembroke Pines Fl City Of, represented by Klahr, Juilie F, Esq., Klein, David Y, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Notice of Filing
Date: April 18, 2013Assignment of Judgment
Date: May 23, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to SHD Legal Group PA Tr Acct per cert ($92.200.00) mailed |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
May 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Bid Payor: Zulekha Bhaila ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20131RA1A010893; ;Amount: $92,200.00 |
|
May 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Clerk's Fee Payor: Zulekha Bhaila ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20131RA1A010893; ;Amount: $1,390.50 |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
May 23, 2013 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment Party: Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST AND ADVANCES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.