Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brutus, Gerline, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Silverman, Marc A, Esq., against Casa Chanpet Inc, Mayard, Ernst, represented by Stoner, Charlton, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: August 06, 2014Order
Date: July 11, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: August 06, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Party: Attorney Stoner, Charlton Attorney Stoner, Charlton |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CASE MANAGEMENT AND NOTICE OF HEARING 8/18/15 8:45 AM RM 1020B |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED VERIFIED MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DEFAULT |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability August 25, 2014 through August 29, 2014 |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit OF ERNST MAYARD, PRESIDENT OF CASA CHANPET, INC. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED VERIFIED MOTIONTO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DEFAULTParty: Defendant Casa Chanpet Inc Defendant Mayard, Ernst |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEFEDANTS' (PROPOSED) ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESParty: Defendant Casa Chanpet Inc Defendant Mayard, Ernst |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Law IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED VERIFIED MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DEFAULTParty: Defendant Casa Chanpet Inc Defendant Mayard, Ernst |
|
August 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Unopposed Motion DANTS' UNOPPOSED VERIFIED MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DEFAULTParty: Defendant Casa Chanpet Inc |
|
August 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this cause shall be called for a hearing before the Honorable Carol-Lisa Philips in Room 10208 of the Broward County Courthouse at 201 SE 6m Street, Fort Lauderdale, Florida o Thursday, August 18,2014 at 8:45 a.m. upon the following motion |
|
August 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Current Address Party: Defendant Casa Chanpet Inc Defendant Mayard, Ernst |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.