Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wadler, Joan, Esq., against Basta, Blazenka, Basta, Milan, Elm Gardens Condo Inc, Hawaiian Gardens Phase I Assn Inc, represented by Grady, Jacqueline A, Kubicki, Draper, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Joint Stipulation
Date: January 16, 2014Joint Stipulation
Date: February 12, 2014Agreed Order
Date: February 12, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Title Issued Sent to Recording SOLD TO: PLAINTIFF |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FBN# 91447 |
|
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Consent to Substitution of Counsel | |
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order OF JOINT STIPULATION FOR SIJBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL : Kubicki Draper |
|
February 12, 2014 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney sale date 2/12/2014 |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.