Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sra Tamarac Med Plaza Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Rosenthal, Alex Paul, against Allaf, Waddah, Allaf, Waddah, Md, represented by Babnik, Andrew, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: April 29, 2013Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 22, 2013Interrogatories
Date: April 24, 2013Stipulation for-of Settlement
Date: August 13, 2013Agreed Order
Date: May 02, 2013Request for Production of Documents
Date: April 24, 2013Agreed Order
Date: August 15, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation for-of Settlement | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on pl's mot to compel/granted |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Interrogs SECOND AMENDED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTIONParty: Defendant Allaf, Waddah, MD Defendant Allaf, Waddah |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories Party: Defendant Allaf, Waddah, MD Defendant Allaf, Waddah |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents Party: Defendant Allaf, Waddah, MD Defendant Allaf, Waddah |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories AMENDEDParty: Defendant Allaf, Waddah, MD Defendant Allaf, Waddah |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing April 23, 2013 at 8:45 a.m Room 1050 |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff SRA/Tamarac Med Plaza LLC |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 06/10/13 at 11:15 rm 880B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.