Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
My Hands Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Trujillo, Carlos, Esq., against Citizens Prop Ins Corp, represented by Wolf, Jason B, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Request for Production
Date: April 17, 2013Proposal of Settlement
Date: April 03, 2013Notice of Interrogatories
Date: April 17, 2013Ex Parte Order
Date: April 15, 2013Request for Admissions
Date: April 17, 2013Subpoena Filed
Date: April 26, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Directions to the Clerk | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Subpoena Filed | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum (RE-NOTICE) OF Domingo Dos Ramos, Jr. Estimator DDR Claims Consultants Inc |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff My Hands LLC |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff My Hands LLC |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff My Hands LLC |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant' s First Set of Interrogatories and Frst Request for Production, dated January 9, 2013 within ten (10) days of |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposal of Settlement OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO THE PLAINTIFF MY HANDS, LLCParty: Defendant Citizens Prop Ins Corp |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Discovery | |
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.