Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kunselman, Hugh, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Office Of Governor Rick Scott, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus (Civil) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
See Comment
Date: February 20, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
See Comment Motion for leave to file (or Alternative Petition) to Appoint Counse for John and Jane |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Don't Docket On This Case | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complete File Received IN COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER NEW CASE #13-86-CA |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Certifed Mail Receipt | |
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Transfer TO WAKULLA COUNTY; FLD |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Transferring Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus//Granted |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | No Cover Sheet | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: KUNSELMAN, HUGH ; Userid: CTS-ddore ; Receipt: 20121YE18000273; ; Reason: F00 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition Filed - Habeas Corpus | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | No Summons Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.