Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Nat Assn, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ugarte, Luciana, Esq., against Midland Funding Llc, Hood, Tiffaney Michelle, Gilbert, Joshua, represented by Sandler, Kenneth Scott, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Before Hearing |
|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of hrg 06-18-13 @ 8:45 |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 6/18/13 8:45am 5th fl |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Gilbert, Joshua |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown Parties in Possession # 1 |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/04/12Party: Defendant Gilbert, Joshua |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/04/12Party: Defendant Midland Funding LLC |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown Parties in Possession # 2 |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/06/12Party: Defendant Hood, Tiffaney Michelle |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Unknown parties in possession (1); Unknown parties in possession (2)Party: Defendant Gilbert, Joshua Defendant Hood, Tiffaney Michelle Defendant Midland Funding LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.