Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bridgeview Bank Group, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ellison, Jason M, against Cilulko, Waclaw, United States Of America, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Comm Foreclosure =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion for Entry
Date: July 24, 2013Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: September 17, 2013Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: September 17, 2013Motion for Garnishment After Judgment
Date: September 17, 2013Notice
Date: September 24, 2013Notice
Date: October 02, 2013Motion for Contempt
Date: October 30, 2013Order to Show Cause
Date: November 05, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Garnishee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM/GARNISHEE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to John B Kent esq/mailed to same; garn; Wells Fargo Bank/ $100.00/ ct reg |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice OF RECORDINGParty: Plaintiff Bridgeview Bank Group |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT OF COURT AS TO DEFENDANT WACLAW ?'WALLY" CILULKOParty: Plaintiff Bridgeview Bank Group |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Refund Payor: USAMERIBANK ; Userid: CTS-gduponty ; Receipt: 20131YC1A014345; ;Amount: $4.00 |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT / Wells Fargo Bank, N.A |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to Wargo & French LLP/mailed to same; garn: JPMorgan Chase Bank/ $100.00/ ct reg |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.