Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Drayton, Caeden C, against Gonzalez, Alvaro, Sanchez, Elizabeth, Santa Monica Townhomes Ho Assn Inc, represented by Reeves, Betty Jean, Valancy, Steven S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 01, 2013Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: September 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Evidence Disposed: Original Returned to Atty Sub- With Copies Plantiff 1 Original Note & Mortgage Released to Diego Anie Per Court Order with Proper ID |
|
January 09, 2014 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication January 9, 2014 |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: ZACHARY D. HERMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20131FA1A090354; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale CANCEL JANUARY 9, 2014 FORECLOSURE SALE. VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT. DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION AND RETURN RIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGEParty: Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank NA |
|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney 9th day ofJanuary, 2014 |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney | |
October 02, 2013 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Ord Canceling/Rescheduling Clerk's Fclsre Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.