Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mansoor, Nusrat, against Bertholand Louis-Jeune, Ford'S Manor Village Ho Assn Inc, Jeune, Guerland Louis, represented by Chandler, Edward J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Directions to the Clerk | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Lack of Prosecution | |
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAMEParty: Attorney Mansoor, Nusrat |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Before Hearing |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11-27-12Party: Defendant Jeune, Guerland Louis |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved unknown tenant |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/27/12Party: Defendant Bertholand Louis-Jeune |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/27/12Party: Defendant Ford's Manor Village HO Assn Inc |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Ford's Manor Village HO Assn Inc |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Ford's Manor Village HO Assn Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.