Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schlichtmann, Donald, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Pro Se, against Conly, James, represented by Schner, Larry Elliot, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Motion and Order
Date: January 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Comment: nh was sent to judge |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lack of Prosecution / COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS / NOTICE OF HEARING/ 07/15/15 |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Comment: sent not of hrg to judge |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing ON PLAINTIFF DONALD SCHLICTMANN'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT/ For 04/3/2014 at 8:45 am, Rm 990 |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion and Order LACK OF PROSECUTION March 14, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 990 |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lack of Prosecution if no such record activity occurs within 60 days |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss ComplaintParty: Defendant Conly, James |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/29/12Party: Defendant Conly, James |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: SCHLICHTMANN, DONALD ; Userid: CTS-dlewis ; Receipt: 20121YE1A007844; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.