Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Altemar, Karline L, against Arrieta, Berenice, Blvd Heights Neighborhood Assn Inc, Household Finance Corp Iii, Perez, Michael, State Farm Auto Ins Co, (total of 7) See All represented by Dunn, Mark S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Order
Date: September 03, 2013Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 13, 2014Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 16, 2014Amended Complaint
Date: March 16, 2015Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: April 02, 2015Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: April 27, 2015Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: April 28, 2015Order
Date: April 28, 2015Agreed Order
Date: May 08, 2015Agreed Order
Date: May 08, 2015Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: June 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference Tuesday, November 17, 2015 at 01:30 PM RM 519 |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Voluntary DismissalParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference rm 519 Wednesday. October 14. 2015 at 01:30 PM |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Order On Case Management Conference | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default Against State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co and Unknown Tenant 1 nka Joshua VaronParty: Defendant Arrieta, Berenice Defendant Perez, Michael Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA Defendant Blvd Heights Neighborhood Assn Inc Defendant Household Finance Corp III |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served December 06, 2012Party: Defendant Arrieta, Berenice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.