Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Onillo, Stephen, Esq., against Jasmine Lakes Club Inc, Jasmine Lake I Condo Assn Inc, Cunningham, Carlton A, represented by Daley, Shelley J, Fleysher, Emil, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Agreed Order
Date: June 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing June 11,2013 at 8:45AM Rm# 518 or 519 |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to ComplaintParty: Defendant Cunningham, Carlton A |
|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance of counsel emil fleysher |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint ans to pl's complaintParty: Defendant Jasmine Lake I Condo Assn Inc |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Tenant |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/13/12Party: Defendant Cunningham, Carlton A |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/12/12Party: Defendant Jasmine Lake I Condo Assn Inc |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown spouse of Carlton A Cunningham AKA Carlton Alexander Cunningham |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.