Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Alejanda Madera, et al Plaintiff vs. Henry Herman Defendant
On November 05, 2012 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2012
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: Jul 01, 2013Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 17, 2013Request for Copies
Date: May 15, 2013Request for Examination
Date: Apr 24, 2013Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 24, 2013Response to Request for Production
Date: Apr 24, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT, HENRY HERMAN'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS, ALEJANDRA MADERA ad LINGI RAMONESParty: Plaintiff Ramones, Lingi Plaintiff Madera, Alejanda |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT, HENRY HERMAN'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS, ALEJANDRA MADERA ad LINGI RAMONESParty: Plaintiff Madera, Alejanda Plaintiff Ramones, Lingi |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Subpoena for Trial Duces Tecum Returned Served | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objection Party: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party rc/meorial hosp west,select physical therapy,memorial primary care clinic,bethesda adult care home,place at weston and total health care service 5-17-13 |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objection Party: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies Party: Plaintiff Ramones, Lingi Plaintiff Madera, Alejanda |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Taking Deposition ALEJANDRA MADERA Friday, June 14, 2013 Beginning at 2:00 p.m |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies Party: Plaintiff Madera, Alejanda Plaintiff Ramones, Lingi |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Taking Deposition ALEJANDRA MADERA |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 4/29/13 @ 8:45 RM 920B |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Examination REOUEST FOR EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.360 - that Plaintiff, ALEJANDRA MADERAParty: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories NEGLIGENCEParty: Plaintiff Madera, Alejanda |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Madera, Alejanda |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLF'S ANSWERS TO DF'S CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Ramones, Lingi |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Deft's Motion to Compel Discovery Propounded to Pltf on March 27, 2013 is Granted. |
|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing April 15, 2013 , 8:45 a.m |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objection and compliance with HIPAAParty: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Examination pursuant to rule 1.360Party: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion requesting notice for non-emergency procedureParty: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 4/3/13 8:45 RM 920B |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Plaintiff Ramones, Lingi Plaintiff Madera, Alejanda |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Plaintiff Madera, Alejanda Plaintiff Ramones, Lingi |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Availability Michael Austin Robb Esq |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Availability Michael Austin Robb Esq |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs to pltfParty: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Production to pltfParty: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs consortiumParty: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/9/12Party: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: COHEN, MICHAEL J ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007493; omments: CK 1594 S-1 HB TO PS ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued hb to psParty: Defendant Herman, Henry |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: COHEN, MICHAEL J ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007493; omments: CK 1594 S-1 HB TO PS ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |