Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Onillo, Stephen, Esq., against Emerald Lake Estates At The Landings Assn Inc, Landings Master Assn Inc, Panache At The Landings Ho Assn Inc, Pnc Bank Na, Solum, Jan, (total of 6) See All represented by Perez-Siam, Frank, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Comment: check returned/ remailed to same address (suite 302A) |
|
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned Served Party: Defendant Solum, Jan |
|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Undeliverable | |
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to Moris Hardwick Schneider llc trust acct/mailed to same; cert dated 8/13/13; $207,300.00/ ct reg |
|
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued to Process Server HB |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Title Issued Sent to Recording sold to: LBS2013 FAMILY HOMES, LLC |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
August 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Clerk's Fee Payor: Howard Steklof ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20131RA1A015680; ;Amount: $3,117.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.