Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Old Republic Ins Co, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ginsberg, Eliot H, against Gil-Medina, Maria, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 02, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy SBA: 13-34295-RBR |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
eWrit Issuance - Execution Maria Gil-Medina f/k/a Maria Santiago/$38,141.51 |
|
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Old Republic Ins Co |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing October 2nd 2013, 8.45am |
|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff Old Republic Ins Co |
|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit IN PROOF OF CLAIM |
|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Fees | |
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF COUNSEL OF RECORD |
|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs & Interest | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change SOLOMON , VIGH , CHATANI AND SOLOMON , P.A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.