Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rodriguez, Eduardo F, Rodriguez, Magaly E, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Aylin, Morales, against Florida Ins Guaranty Assn Inc, represented by Dugan, Robert O, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2012 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Notice of Interrogatories
Date: August 21, 2013Answer to Interrogs
Date: September 27, 2013Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 11, 2014Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 16, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: June 30, 2014Order Setting
Date: June 30, 2014Memorandum in Opposition
Date: July 07, 2014Order Denying Motion
Date: July 17, 2014Expert Witness List
Date: September 02, 2014Expert Interrogatories
Date: September 02, 2014Ex Parte Order
Date: October 29, 2013Notice of Mediation
Date: August 01, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: July 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720 - Second AmendedParty: Defendant Florida Ins Guaranty Assn Inc |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Expert Witness List Party: Defendant Florida Ins Guaranty Assn Inc |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Expert Interrogatories NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFSParty: Defendant Florida Ins Guaranty Assn Inc |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Eduardo F Plaintiff Rodriguez, Magaly E |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant Florida Ins Guaranty Assn Inc |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Amended CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720Party: Defendant Florida Ins Guaranty Assn Inc |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720Party: Defendant Florida Ins Guaranty Assn Inc |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation 09/29/14 2:00 pm |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing original transcript of the hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, which was held on Juy 9, 2014 before Judge John Murphy, and must be considered by this Court in matters presently pendig before the CourtParty: Defendant Florida Ins Guaranty Assn Inc |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is/DENIED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.