Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
M & T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Weitzman, Carly R, against Department Of Housing & Urban Develop, Spear, Kevin M, Spear, Nancy C, represented by Braber, Roberta Boyer, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Agreed Order
Date: August 05, 2013Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 03, 2013Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 16, 2014Order Setting
Date: March 06, 2015Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: March 06, 2015Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: March 06, 2015Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 11, 2014Order Setting
Date: March 06, 2015Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Pursuant to Settlement - Before Hearing |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting N/J Trial 4/22/15 at 1:30 PM Rm 510 |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to General Magistrate SCHEDULING ORDER/ 04/22/2015 TIME 1:30P.M RM 510 |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Referral to General Magistrate | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting N/J Trial 4/22/15 at 1:30 PM Rm 518 |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff M & T Bank |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion TO SET CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff M & T Bank |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel CARLY R WELTZMAN ESQ/ 89862Party: Plaintiff M & T Bank |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Roberta Boyer Braber (Atty) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.