Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Onewest Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jackson, Laura Ashley, against Miciak, Mary, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Devel, Tonielli, Ermine Mary, Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: December 27, 2013Order
Date: June 12, 2014Letter/Answer
Date: July 24, 2014Assignment of Bid
Date: January 26, 2015Order
Date: January 28, 2015Agreed Order
Date: December 31, 2013Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: September 02, 2014Motion
Date: January 26, 2015Motion for Leave to File
Date: April 30, 2014Amended Complaint
Date: April 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | eWrit Issuance - Possession | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order ON ASSIGNEE'S MOTION TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION/granted |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on JULY 21, 2015 AT 8:45AM, RM 519 |
|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEMAND FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY/ASSEGNEE FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Undeliverable | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: DASHIA TROWERS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A027966; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession FILED BY--FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Kahane & Associates, P.A |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF CREDIT BID is granted. pltfs credit bid is hereby assigned t federal natl mtg assn and cert of title shall be issued to same. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.