Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Naderpour, Amir, against Miles, Marlon D, represented by Barrow, Jennifer M, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Notice of Filing
Date: August 09, 2013Agreed Order
Date: August 20, 2013Order
Date: November 19, 2013Ex Parte Motion
Date: June 09, 2014Order
Date: November 17, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW EXHIBIT(S) FROM COURT RECORD/GRANTED |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: NADERPOUR ASSOC PA ; Userid: CTS-ahardy ; Receipt: 20141YE14000396; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Reopen Case Billed Ex Parte Mot to Withdraw Exhibit(s) from the Court RecordParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA Amount: $50.00 |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO WITHDRAW EXHIBIT(S) FROM THE COURT RECORDParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Directions to the Clerk | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing NOTICE OF FILING -ORIGINAL NOTE |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing the attached Affidavit in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary JudgmentParty: Defendant Miles, Marlon D |
|
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing August 19, 2013 at 8:45 AM; RM 850 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.