Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Regions Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Werber, Benjamin K, against Bazan, Victoria, Hernandez, Rafael, Hernandez, Rosa Elilia, represented by Wagner, Jordan, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Assignment of Bid
Date: October 30, 2013Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: November 07, 2013Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: February 11, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: June 12, 2013Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 30, 2014Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Comment: Original Note & Mortgage Documents returned on 09/02/14 |
|
August 12, 2014 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: BARRY FISHMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A078681; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale MOTION TO CANCEL SALE, DISMISS ACTION, DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS. VACATE JUDGMENT, AND RETURN THE ORIGINL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGEParty: Plaintiff Regions Bank |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form - Disposed By Judge | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney | |
May 13, 2014 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Ord Canceling/Rescheduling Clerk's Fclsre Sale | |
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Celeste Vilonna ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20141RA1A012549; ;Amount: $70.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.