Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Foust, Jason A, against Persaud, Norawati, represented by Budnik, Carolyn N, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
See Comment
Date: May 20, 2014Assignment of Bid
Date: August 25, 2014See Comment
Date: March 21, 2014Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: November 13, 2014Order Denying Motion
Date: May 05, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 08, 2015See Comment
Date: April 14, 2014Order
Date: August 20, 2014Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 27, 2015Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: August 20, 2014Agreed Order
Date: April 24, 2014Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: February 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing May 17, 2016 @ 1:30PM RM 518/519 |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: BARRY FISHMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A175469; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO CHANGE COUNSEL OF RECORD | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR MAY 12, 2015Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
May 12, 2015 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Suggestion of Bankruptcy |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy 15-18541-JKO |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR MAY 12, 2015 |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: CAROLYN N. BUDNIK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A057908; ;Amount: $50.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.