Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lakeside Key Homeowners' Assn Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Montekio, Michelle, Esq., against Fenderson, Reginia, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation Of Hearing 06-20-2012 |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment of foreclosure (exhibits attach)Party: Plaintiff Lakeside Key Homeowners' Assn Inc |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Returned - Attorney Notified Df Regina Fenderson filed a responsive pleading 03-19-2012 |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Generic Party(s) UKN PRESONS IN POSSESSION |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Fenderson, reginia |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 03/01/2012Party: Defendant Fenderson, reginia |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: MONTEKIO ESQ, MICHELLE ; Userid: CTS-jbrown ; Receipt: 20121YE1A001340; omments: CK#10292/S-1/HB/RUNNER ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MONTEKIO ESQ, MICHELLE ; Userid: CTS-jbrown ; Receipt: 20121YE1A001340; omments: CK#10292/S-1/HB/RUNNER ;Amount: $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.