Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by O'Grady, Mark N, against Bank Of America Na, Boglioli, Theresa, Business Litany, Lennar Homes Inc, Uamc Asset Corp, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: April 04, 2014Order
Date: February 02, 2015Response to Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 02, 2014Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 04, 2014Motion to Withdraw
Date: May 23, 2014Motion
Date: December 05, 2014Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: July 17, 2014Motion
Date: January 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of the ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSIONParty: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | eWrit Issuance - Possession | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Order/Issue Writ of Possession | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing September 02, 2015 at 1:30 PM RM 519 |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: MARK O'GRADY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A081398; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Comment: Plese issue title fee paid on 4/29/2015 |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.