Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Malone, William A, Esq., against Coconut Sound Rec Assn Inc, Silverlakes Community Assn Inc, Ford Motor Credit Co, Brown, Edward J, Jr., represented by Goldwyn, Brian S., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with , Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Comment: original note and mortgage documents returned on 10/03/2013.. |
|
January 29, 2013 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: RONALD R. WOLFE ASSOC. PL ; Userid: CTS-ahardy ; Receipt: 20121YE14007202; omments: MOT FOR ORD DISMISSING CASE ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 1-09-13 8:45 rm 518 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of ord dismissing case, can fcslre sale, can not of lis pendens, and setting aside FSJ and directingclerk to return orig loan docs and to substitute photostatic copies in the ct fileParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication RONALD R. WOLFE & ASSOCIATES, P.L. |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale | |
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Copies Mailed to all Parties; ORD/NSDB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.