Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kunjbehari, Joyce, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anchell, Alan, against Lamfis Inc, Roussin, Peter, Jr., represented by Critelli-Fabiano, Sheri, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2012 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Motion
Date: May 22, 2013Stipulation
Date: July 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Directions to the Clerk STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL & ORDER DISMISSING CASE |
|
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation OF DEPOSITION/JORDAN GRABEL, MD c/o SHERI CRITELLI-FABIANO, ESQ./JULY 10, 2013 @ 5:00 P.M. |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Party: Plaintiff Kunjbehari, Joyce |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Jordan Grabel, MD |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Camelia Abushaqra June 11, 2013 US Legal Support at 11:00 a.m |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITYParty: Attorney Critelli-Fabiano, Sheri, ESQ. Attorney Critelli-Fabiano, Sheri, ESQ. | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 3/13/13 8:45am rm 960 |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Kunjbehari, Joyce |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Kunjbehari, Joyce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.