Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citicorp Tr Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mcgovern, Matthew W, Esq., against Perillo, Debora L, Perillo, Ralph J, Zippay, Henry R, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with , Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Letter to Judge
Date: October 07, 2013Emergency Motion
Date: July 22, 2013Order
Date: July 23, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Comment: original note returned on 12/03/2013... |
|
October 22, 2013 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication SALE DATE 10/22/13 |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: SUSAN SPARKS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20131FA1A074800; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter to Judge Party: Plaintiff Citicorp Tr Bank FSB |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Judgment FORECLOSURE, CANCEL SALE DATE, RELEASE LIS PENDENS, RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE, AND DISMISS CSEParty: Plaintiff Citicorp Tr Bank FSB |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed After Hearing |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney 22nd day of October, 2013 |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
July 23, 2013 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.