Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Melville, Drew, against Baffy Woods Condo Assn Inc, Mcgrath, Amy, represented by Meanley, Brian T, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
November 27, 2012 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Drew Melville ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20121RA1A019299; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication PHELAN HALLINAN PLC |
|
September 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Copies Mailed to all Parties; FJ/NSDB | |
September 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale | |
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing original note & RECORDED MORTGAGEParty: Plaintiff Bank of America N A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.