Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hernandez, Cornelio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robinson, Dallas A, against Weiss, Judith, Weiss, Leonard, represented by Capece, Angelina C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2012 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: May 09, 2013Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 22, 2013Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: May 09, 2013Request for Copies
Date: June 27, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Hernandez, Cornelio |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies Party: Plaintiff Hernandez, Cornelio |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Request to Produce FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Defendant Weiss, Leonard Defendant Weiss, Judith |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Interrogatories NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFParty: Plaintiff Hernandez, Cornelio |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Request to Produce FOR PRODUCTIONParty: Defendant Weiss, Judith Defendant Weiss, Leonard |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Witness & Exhibit List Party: Defendant Weiss, Leonard Defendant Weiss, Judith |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Weiss, Leonard Defendant Weiss, Judith |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Weiss, Judith Defendant Weiss, Leonard |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Filed SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition of Jessica Basilico |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.